THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS, NEWTON IN MAKERFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- St Helens
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETERS PCC, NEWTON IN MAKERFIELD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Robert Taylor | Chair | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christopher Webster | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Clare Turley | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Caroline Louise Duffy | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Frances Johnson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Hutton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wendy Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Brammeier | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ARCHIBALD | Trustee | 27 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN CAMPBELL HENRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.94k | £88.74k | £90.60k | £80.61k | £79.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.67k | £89.30k | £91.87k | £86.04k | £94.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Church
Church Street
NEWTON-LE-WILLOWS
Merseyside
WA12 9SR
- Phone:
- 07341 940 975
- Email:
- revjrtaylor@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
stpetersnewton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window