Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS PRESTON
Charity number: 1132970

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Nathan Buttery | Chair | 10 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Katie Stanton | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan MacRae | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ivan Yow | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Huw Griffiths | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Holly Tween | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Stewart | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan McIntosh | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr LAURA OLIVER | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHELLEY BURROWS | Trustee | 24 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS SUTCLIFFE-CAMPO | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BIDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr ANDREW GEORGE GLENDINNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALD DAVID BURROWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.