Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHNS, SOUTHALL GREEN

Charity number: 1132155
Charity reporting is up to date (196 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £255.37k £207.38k £290.70k £313.88k £405.45k
Total expenditure £236.42k £208.27k £224.43k £291.23k £272.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A