TRINITY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF 16 CHURCHES FOLLOWING THE MERGER OF THE WORKSOP & KIVETON CIRCUIT WITH THE RETFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT THROUGH PROVIDING MINISTERS, TRAINING AND RESOURCES. TRINITY CIRCUIT OPERATES IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA COVERING PARTS OF NORTH NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

26 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
Governance
- 02 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 26 March 2013: Funds received from 1134360 RETFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
- WORKSOP & KIVETON METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JULIE IRENE COATES | Chair | 10 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Joy Fuller | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Margaret Bareham Burton | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Deacon Sarah Emily Hoe-Crook | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Carole Osborn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Daphne Elizabeth Nickson Sidney | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
HILARY MARY BENNETT | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Annette Westerby | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Glenn Wayne Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Valerie Hinchliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Peter Hinchliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Westerby | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
William Spencer Welchman | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
JANICE MARY SYKES | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alan Ellis Laurie | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
GEORGE ROY BENNETT | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
ANDREA DIANE WELCHMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Marion Hodgson | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Lyndon Jenkin | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
COLIN WALKER | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
SUSAN JANE WALKER | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
NICOLA JAYNE ROWSON | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID BURTON | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
JUDITH ANNE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MRS SUE BAGGALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MRS SUE BOYLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.19k | £200.23k | £210.94k | £166.70k | £190.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.07k | £194.06k | £237.62k | £274.91k | £386.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Hallcroft Road
Retford
DN22 7LB
- Phone:
- 01777 702573
- Email:
- admin@trinitycircuit.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window