THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. BARTHOLOMEW, ARMLEY WITH ST. MARY, NEW WORTLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of religious activities. Pastoral care to the people of Armley and New Wortley in Leeds, especially to the aged, sick and dying. Provides buildings and facilities for use by the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £420 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ARMLEY AND NEW WORTLEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THELMA COLLINS | Chair |
|
||||||
Christian Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benita Mary Slater | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graham Barber B.A. FRCO | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robinson | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Anne Handley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY LEE WHITEHEAD MBA BSC | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN KAYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.05k | £44.31k | £45.39k | £57.03k | £41.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.76k | £36.40k | £45.00k | £53.06k | £45.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.58k | £420 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 GOTTS PARK VIEW
LEEDS
LS12 2QZ
- Phone:
- 01132636745
- Email:
- stbartsarmley@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window