BICESTER BUCKINGHAM BRACKLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The provision of regular public acts of worship open to members of the church and non members alike. b) The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. c) Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. d) Taking religious assemblies in local schools. e) Promoting Christianity through events and services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

27 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Northamptonshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE MANN MA BD ACA | Chair | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sara Cliff | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR MUTTON | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDY LEWIS | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
IRENE COX | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL LANGLEY | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROGER LEE | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK MUNN | Trustee | 31 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
BILL CRISP | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Ioannou | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIM EDWORTHY | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET CRISP | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT HODGES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Goulder | Trustee | 31 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hodges | Trustee | 31 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN EVANS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARETH EVANS | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
LINDA PAICE | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE WILSON | Trustee | 16 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN GARDNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID TECKOE FCA, CTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATIE MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN GEORGE PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOREEN TECKOE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BUTCHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWYNNETH AKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.83k | £156.22k | £147.46k | £133.71k | £149.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.42k | £149.58k | £156.11k | £150.63k | £186.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 July 2020 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paddock House
Lower Road
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX25 1TG
- Phone:
- 01869240932
- Email:
- minmann@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window