THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of religion for the public benefit by: Providing regular worship open to all and a sacred space for personal prayer. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, and other special need groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Poole
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST.GEORGE'S PCC, OAKDALE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Penelope Marynice Draper | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Edwards | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne-Marie Seraphin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Seraphin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Katharine Fairhead | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Barbara Graves | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Elizabeth Bursey | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Elisabeth Read | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Douglas Edwards | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Frake | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Phillips | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Julie Marie Laura Shearing | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Michael Lewis | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
SUSAN KATHRYN COLBORNE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline West | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Johanna Barton | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PAMELA CLARK | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN ANN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev THOMAS LOCK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.31k | £83.85k | £92.11k | £115.84k | £121.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.91k | £77.26k | £103.41k | £117.80k | £115.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Georges Church
Darbys Lane
POOLE
BH15 3EU
- Phone:
- 01202660612
- Email:
- admin@stgeorgesoakdale.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window