Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BASINGSTOKE

Charity number: 1133775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £274.45k £365.21k £381.10k £627.28k £754.80k
Total expenditure £264.00k £300.66k £414.43k £728.17k £794.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £503 £332 £680
Income from government grants £23.96k £14.67k N/A £200 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £207.27k £226.96k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £105.60k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £270.78k £387.75k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £43.63k £58.93k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £81.16k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £10.30k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £726.72k £793.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £1.45k £860
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £43.32k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £10.92k £10.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £1.45k £860
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0