Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAWFORD, ESSEX

Charity Number: 1133132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £77.57k £55.79k £61.97k £80.04k £194.82k
Total expenditure £80.30k £68.85k £62.44k £81.07k £137.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.50k £3.50k N/A N/A N/A