THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HINCKLEY ST. MARY THE VIRGIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all.The provision of sacred space for personal prayer.Pastoral work.Teaching christianity through sermons,taking assemblies in schools, and the distribution of litterature.Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for senior citizens,parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST. MARY'S PCC. HINCKLEY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Hamilton | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Sandford | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Emmett-Pace | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matilde Fernandes | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brian Chapman | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Alesbrook | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cattell | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Richard Hill | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Harris | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Simpson | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Seal | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judy Williams | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MOORE | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Alesbrook | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Pettit | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS VAL CARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR MORTON CROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEVERLY JAYNE FRETTSOME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH CHRISTINE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.41k | £137.50k | £135.49k | £191.19k | £175.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.01k | £137.50k | £136.78k | £185.13k | £158.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2024 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary's Church
Church Walk
HINCKLEY
Leicestershire
LE10 1DW
- Phone:
- 01455234241
- Email:
- office@stmaryshinckley.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window