COLCHESTER ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a centre for Christian Worship and outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CRBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Fitzgerald | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Sally Neal | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Delve | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Crossley | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|||||
David Morris | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fran Alexander | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev JERRY BROWN | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN CARRON | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM PETER ABBOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £259.89k | £208.36k | £215.57k | £273.77k | £265.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.96k | £200.78k | £223.28k | £273.00k | £282.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 March 2024 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2024 | 410 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 February 2023 | 393 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLCHESTER ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
COLCHESTER ROAD
IPSWICH
IP4 4ST
- Phone:
- 01473680766
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window