Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1132070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £994.91k £361.89k £325.63k £376.77k £314.88k
Total expenditure £406.74k £802.45k £323.39k £429.22k £318.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.60k £35.88k £3.25k £800 £500
Income - Donations and legacies £987.54k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £6.92k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £447 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £391.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £360 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £139.82k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A