Trustees Cromer PCC
Charity number: 1135323

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William John Warren BA | Chair | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Jacquier | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Averil Boyle | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Marielle Woodfield | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anderson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rosemary McCandlish | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Kimble | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Tuthill | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN ANDERSON | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD PURSLOW FRICS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CHARLES LOADES | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL HODGKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID GEORGE ORSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS ANNE COTTINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.