Financial history HOPE CHURCH BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1132584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £192.20k £183.30k £293.35k £215.94k £202.19k
Total expenditure £210.28k £193.43k £168.66k £217.51k £216.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A