Trustees THIRSK AND NORTHALLERTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1133873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Erik Matthews Trustee 15 November 2024
NORTHALLERTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Naomi Alejandra Hogan Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Rev Kim Hurst Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
KEITH SMITH Trustee 14 May 2024
KNAYTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Megan Turner Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Lesley Hansen Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Ian Johnson Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Lynne Sharp Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Robert Lynton Portsmouth Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
William George Harker Trustee 01 September 2022
WENDY'S WISH
Received: On time
Stephen Mark Reynolds Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Thelma Richardson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Catherine Louise Woods Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dorothy Margaret McCrea Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Andrew Simon Dalby Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
alana barney Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Kevin Richard Baker Trustee 17 October 2018
None on record
Karen Portsmouth Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
Judith Walker Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
Kathryn Walker Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
Karen Yvonne Collin Trustee 31 March 2017
None on record
AUDREY POWELL Trustee
None on record
Rev Michael Webster Trustee
NORTHALLERTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRENDA DENNISON Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY BROWN Trustee
None on record