Trustees TRINITY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WIMBLEDON) CHARITY
Charity number: 1134743

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jacob Bali | Chair | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Eric Chau | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Melrose | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Vivienne Wood | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Watson Rostron | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary McKay Bell Nicol aka 'May' | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Anne de Grouchy | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Guthrie Tulloch | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Trehearn | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel George Elliot | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jawdat - known as 'Dodie' Khurshid | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Napier Goodchild | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.