Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S CHURCH, WINCHMORE HILL

Charity Number: 1133942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £174.67k £312.80k £304.70k £232.84k £201.17k
Total expenditure £211.84k £200.35k £416.49k £224.81k £228.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.80k £2.11k N/A N/A N/A