Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN, KIRKHEATON, WEST YORKSHIRE
Charity Number: 1134019

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Robert Jones | Chair | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
David Stanley Ashwell | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Gareth Womack | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Glendinning Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Leonard | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Luke Chawner | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Louise Atkinson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel William Codman | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan George Dunlop | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Rodney Manfield | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Sheard | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Littlewood | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Mark Gurr | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Donald Sheard | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Irene Margaret Rodgerson | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alan Conley | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Julie Booth | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Eabry | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joan Dickinson | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.