Financial history FINCHAMPSTEAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £814.07k £688.19k £602.01k £694.51k £804.29k
Total expenditure £841.00k £788.51k £622.48k £717.52k £841.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £27.00k £38.21k £4.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £303.22k £410.33k £255.77k £237.53k £252.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £275.36k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £508.06k £0 £345.03k £451.64k £536.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.79k £2.50k £1.22k £1.34k £14.92k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £4.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £841.00k £788.51k £622.48k £717.52k £841.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £334.08k £5.07k £5.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £49.36k £44.89k £37.99k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0