THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS HORDLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
*Regular public worship open to all*Pastoral work,including visiting the sick and the bereaved*Teaching of Christianity through sermans, courses and small groups*Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups*Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ALL SAINTS, HORDLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Stocker | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Hones | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edmonds | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angus Wood | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Bailey | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Gammon | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Benson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Edmonds | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Mullins | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wyatt | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne McMurtry | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Moody-Jones | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Pickburn | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK STRODE | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN RACHEL MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY MARGUERITE MOYNAGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.47k | £159.16k | £193.37k | £171.65k | £184.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.51k | £154.33k | £154.49k | £161.85k | £180.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £900 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £900 | £1.64k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Office
All Saints Memorial Hall
Hordle Lane
Hordle
Lymington
SO41 0FB
- Phone:
- 01425 626565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window