THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, ADEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council (PCC) have the responsibility of promoting in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Adel, the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, together with maintenance responsibilities for the Grade 1 listed building of the Church of St.John the Baptist, with its Churchyard and the Grade 2 listed building used as the Church Hall (The Old Stables)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ADEL PCC LEEDS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alison Battye | Chair | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Tunstall | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thang Xuan Tang | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Smith | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Smithies | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Barker | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Loveday Loveridge | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina Gledhill | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marisa Clayton | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Sarah Johnson | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Seaward | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Best-Shaw | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Howarth | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bob Holloway | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNY JONES | Trustee | 31 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE CATHERINE COLE BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LAVINIA LARNER MA OXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BRUCE BUCHAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.50k | £105.85k | £121.84k | £120.66k | £138.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.46k | £96.53k | £120.04k | £149.51k | £140.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stables
Back Church Lane
LEEDS
LS16 8DW
- Phone:
- 07415424964
- Email:
- adelpccsecretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window