Financial history ST THOMAS METHODIST CHURCH, EXETER

Charity Number: 1135010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £170.68k £169.31k £65.51k £70.96k £60.28k
Total expenditure £156.28k £163.10k £65.92k £58.48k £60.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A