Financial history SHREWSBURY UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity Number: 1135733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £171.50k £127.19k £135.44k £146.82k £154.40k
Total expenditure £161.49k £94.42k £145.03k £158.20k £148.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A