Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLMER WITH HUNTINGTON
Charity number: 1135577

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Heather Maxwell | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Maxwell | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Erin Mariah Butler | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerald William Ridley | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sheila Elizabeth Tolson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Jefferis | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Hampshire | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Waring-Jenkins | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean King | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PRICE | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY BURGE | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANIS GOUGH | Trustee | 13 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HARTLAND | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|||||
MARGARET JESSIE LOVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NANCY MARY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY JANE ROCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY CYNTHIA HARTLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.