THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TETTENHALL REGIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

27 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 05 May 2022: Funds received from 1001514 TETTENHALL REGIS EDUCATIONAL FUND
- THE PARISH OF TETTENHALL REGIS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Anne Cadwallader | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark David Cadwallader | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS DYMOND | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David WILLS | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Preece | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Pugh | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dot Clayton | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Holt | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN ROBERTS | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marion Burns | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Campbell | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iggy Peters | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Brown | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert John Graham | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PHILIP DEEMING | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERTA KATE EVANS | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Eldon | Trustee | 26 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRETA LOWE | Trustee | 05 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HUGHES | Trustee | 07 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON DOUGLAS | Trustee | 07 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAULA TIMMINS | Trustee | 07 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Michael Spragg | Trustee | 26 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ISOBEL GOLLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDDIE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYRIL GEORGE RANDLES | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID FRANCIS ASTON JACQUES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV RICHARD REEVE BSC BA MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.55k | £240.58k | £261.34k | £291.63k | £289.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.73k | £247.22k | £283.65k | £282.59k | £274.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Cottage
Church Road
Tettenhall
Wolverhampton
WV6 9AJ
- Phone:
- 01902751622
- Email:
- tettenhallregis@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window