THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY THE VIRGIN BURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our church stands in the centre of Bury and has 477 parishioners on the Electoral Roll, in addition we have approx. 100 - 150 children and young people. We are continually working to reach out to the people of Bury,sending a Christian message but also ministering to all who are in any kind of need from any or no faith. Our work is across all generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bury
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 15 May 2023: Funds received from 227037 GUESTS CHARITY
- BURY PARISH CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Craig Anthony Giles | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Ferguson Tait | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Davies | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Higgins | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wight | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lynne Harvey | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julian Roger Heaton | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Pollard | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Keith Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID ANKERS | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Sheila Rachel Beattie | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
||||
ERIC JAMES DUCKWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA LESLEY HAMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY MARGARET ANKERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE JOHN YARWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA UDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA WEBBER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £393.60k | £199.10k | £201.83k | £387.61k | £303.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.29k | £208.14k | £184.02k | £265.74k | £350.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.09k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
Tithebarn Street
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 0JR
- Phone:
- 01617648011
- Email:
- bpc.office@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window