Financial history NORTH HERTS METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1133930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £257.03k £589.64k £216.08k £715.78k £264.05k
Total expenditure £265.39k £278.55k £248.05k £247.76k £458.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.38k £866 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £208.85k N/A £193.84k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £825 N/A £50.40k N/A
Income - Other N/A £379.97k N/A £471.55k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £278.55k N/A £247.76k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £570 N/A £624 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £24.15k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A