THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST MARY'S SWINDON

Charity number: 1134032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £351,603
Total expenditure: £384,267

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
  • 10 January 2022: Funds received from 1098312 KINGSHILL TRUST
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHUCH WITH ST MARY'S PCC SWINDON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheila Wright Trustee 28 April 2024
THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH SWINDON
Received: On time
Helen Hartnell Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Sarah Garrett Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
David Michael Cain Trustee 29 January 2024
PROSPECT HOSPICE LIMITED
Received: On time
BRISTOL CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
BRISTOL CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
Ian Sydney Farr Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Kwok Choi Ng Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Genevieve Anne Williams Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
James Davies-Spratt Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Frances Elizabeth Poel Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Alison Louise Tremlett Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Anthony John Slack Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Simon Giles Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Rose Earle Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Anne Grainger Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Yeoward Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
AILSA PALMER Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Rev SIMON STEVENETTE Trustee
UNITED CHARITIES
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH SWINDON
Received: On time
Rev NORMA EDITH MCKEMEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £439.70k £240.35k £303.87k £307.30k £351.60k
Total expenditure £701.98k £265.49k £273.69k £355.95k £384.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.97k £34.10k £52.85k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 06 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PARISH OFFICE
Community Centre at Christ Church
Cricklade Street
SWINDON
SN1 3HB
Phone:
01793522832