Financial history FARNWORTH AND WORSLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1135135
Charity reporting is up to date (316 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £191.67k £191.37k £173.60k £180.64k £204.33k
Total expenditure £206.24k £207.42k £183.02k £181.81k £186.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A