Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT, NORTH MEOLS

Charity Number: 1133850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £105.91k £123.60k £133.17k £141.47k £413.44k
Total expenditure £147.78k £164.61k £163.41k £166.45k £183.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.25k £648 N/A £533 N/A