Trustees WEST DEVON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134070

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Jean Smallacombe | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Thorne | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Sizmur | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Clifton Yates | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Ward | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Searle | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kyle | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Crawford | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DALTON | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Allin | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barry Francis William Searle | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDY WATERER | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ken Down | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Lilian Couch | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA RUTH TRENAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA MARGARET HOCKRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Trenaman | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE JOYCE COTTLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL ALBERT JOHN CURTICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL GWENDOLINE DOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINIFRED BARBARA DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID FERNLEY JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN SMALLACOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEAN MITCHELL JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OWEN RICHARD VANSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LYN WHITWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARLENE MARY HUNKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN LEONARD MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS RUTH JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID DOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ANDREW JOHN BALSDON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.