Trustees WIDMORE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

40 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DUNCAN JOHN MACBEAN BA Chair 01 September 2015
THE MABOMBOH EDUCATION PROJECT
Received: On time
CHISLEHURST METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Caroline Rose Bullard Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Rev David Gillman Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Joan Mayes Trustee 04 September 2024
None on record
Elaine Margaret Hodges Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Susan Teresa Chown Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Ann Woolins Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Paul Angus John Tickell Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Heidi Jones Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Simon Young Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rodolphe Kowal Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Laura MacBean Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Theophilus Farmer Trustee 01 September 2024
BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Hilary Cheverton Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
BROMLEY AND DOWNHAM BOYS' CLUB
Received: On time
BROMLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Mary Elizabeth Christina Jackson Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SOUTH LONDON SINGERS
Received: On time
BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rene Gerard Meissner Trustee 01 September 2024
BROMLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Nana Ama Brehene Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Pauline Ann Lyons Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
John Ntow Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
John Bayes Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Esther Owusu Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOANNE CUMMINS Trustee 01 September 2024
CROFTON JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: 269 days late
Franklyn Brew Trustee 01 September 2024
ORPINGTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 55 days late
DAVID EWART JACKSON Trustee 01 September 2024
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SOUTH LONDON SINGERS
Received: On time
BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Belynda Pykes Trustee 01 September 2024
FREEMAN GHANAIAN METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
Rev KAREN MARY GEORGE Trustee 01 September 2024
FREEMAN GHANAIAN METHODIST CHURCH
Recently registered
BROMLEY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Caroline Thomas Trustee 01 September 2024
BROMLEY COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES
Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days
Peter James Lake Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Gillian Tompkins Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Mr R Brandhorst Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Mrs D Palmer Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Sharon Wallis Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
JUDITH MARY HOWARD Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
RODNEY JOHN CARDER Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
James Alfred Jeffries Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Jennifer Anne Willson Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
MR CHRIS FIELD Trustee
None on record
EDDIE GREEN Trustee
None on record
PAUL ALANDER CROWTHER MA., BA Trustee
CHISLEHURST METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JOHN NICHOLAS CROWTHER Trustee
BUCKSVISION
Received: On time