Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE

Charity Number: 1134120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Reverend Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Chair 01 April 2013
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Jane Shepard Trustee 01 July 2024
IMMUNODEFICIENCY UK
Received: On time
Rev Simon Goodman Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Joel Podolski Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Holly Amber Cook Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Rev Laura Joanne Verrall-Kelly Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Samuel Patrick Sutherland Williams Trustee 21 February 2022
THE UNITED SOCIETY
Received: On time
Belinda Phillipson Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Esther Keller Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Richard Dyton Trustee 05 October 2020
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Liz Hewitt Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
ADAM DAVID LLOYD Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
AURIOL SARAH BRITTON Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
ELEANOR JANE VOUSDEN Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record