Financial history WIRRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1135375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £742.62k £743.39k £750.23k £797.96k £795.67k
Total expenditure £815.96k £738.55k £790.65k £852.42k £887.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £285 £1.02k £2.91k £8.82k £4.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £742.29k £74.23k £689.39k £789.06k £791.48k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48 £35 £68 £77 £76
Income - Other £0 £0 £57.86k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £815.96k £738.55k £790.65k £852.42k £887.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.92k £11.10k £12.65k £10.05k £30.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.18k £0 £10.91k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0