Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHARLES WITH ST. MATTHIAS, PLYMOUTH

Charity number: 1134139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £543.06k £454.60k £282.10k £322.12k £283.79k
Total expenditure £493.53k £537.64k £356.83k £359.25k £309.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £254.72k £110.51k N/A N/A £972
Income - Donations and legacies £216.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £323.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £493.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £33.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A