THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, BRADFORD ON AVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities in Holy Trinity, and town.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 22 August 2022: Funds received from 900024 FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, BRADFORD ON AVON S...
- BOA HOLY TRINITY PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jennifer Louise Nelson | Chair | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
John Cox | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
LINDSAY JANE DRISCOLL | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||||
Martin Cooke | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mary Forbes | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Clive Adamson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mavis Linstrum | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Helene Steward | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.42k | £118.67k | £117.69k | £149.19k | £125.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.42k | £117.75k | £115.21k | £130.57k | £140.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
Church Street
Bradford on Avon
BA15 1LW
- Phone:
- 01225 864444
- Email:
- beneficeoffice@htboa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window