CORPORATE ALLIANCE AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the financial period the focus has been to build on income generation activities drive forward sustainability and to increase the awareness of reducing the costs and consquences of domestic violence. The trustees are proud to report substanital progress in these areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £74,693 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2010: Standard registration
- 17 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAADV (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.10k | £41.07k | £33.65k | £84.83k | £74.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.65k | £46.44k | £34.25k | £80.51k | £77.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £6.00k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £76.18k | £74.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 02 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 2009 as amended on 26 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
1 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF THOSE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; AND 2 THE PREVENTION OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; AND 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN RELATION TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window