Scarborough, Whitby and Ryedale Mind

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scarborough, Whitby and Ryedale Mind aim to raise awareness and put an end to stigma associated with mental ill health. Providing mental health information, support, training, and advocacy across Scarborough, Whitby, and Ryedale. We offer resources, compassionate support, expert-led training, and amplify voices to create a more informed, supportive community where mental health matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,944 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 January 2010: Standard registration
- 31 August 2012: Funds received from 226729 SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY AND RYEDALE MIND
- SWR MIND (Working name)
- SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY & RYEDALE MIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lloyd | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Alan Gerard Jappy | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Hopkins | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Richard Pearson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Wakelin | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Louise Thomas | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.92k | £313.45k | £365.21k | £403.22k | £255.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.55k | £237.93k | £331.58k | £329.51k | £316.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.96k | £63.14k | £49.96k | £96.74k | £35.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEP 2009 as amended on 23 Sep 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY & RYEDALE AND THEIR SURROUNDS ('AREA OF BENEFIT') THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MENTAL HEALTH) AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS, OBJECTS AND POLICIES OF MIND.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH, WHITBY, RYEDALE AND THEIR SURROUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
24 Huntriss Row
Scarborough
North Yorkshire
YO11 2EG
- Phone:
- 01723339838
- Email:
- info@swrmind.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window