Financial history THE MERIONETH AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 500759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £66.48k £14.92k £104 £69.57k £91.72k
Total expenditure £82.53k £19.96k £16.51k £88.88k £92.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A