Accounts and annual returns THE KING'S SINGERS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1137901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 September 2022 07 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 September 2021 15 July 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 September 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 September 2019 02 November 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 September 2019 Not Required