Financial history THE KING'S SINGERS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/09/2019 07/09/2020 07/09/2021 07/09/2022 07/09/2023
Total gross income £9.23k £1.12k £453 £519 £880
Total expenditure £0 £3.84k £0 £1.59k £165
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A