THE KING'S SINGERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Providing funding to assist The King's Singers in offering choral workshops to groups of students nationwide. 2. Supporting the production of choral training sessions in video form for online viewing and education. 3. Funding choral music commissions from both young and established composers. 4. Offering free or discounted tickets for King's Singers concerts to the young & elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Toyne | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN LUMSDEN | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR ROBERT TEMMINK | Trustee | 29 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BICKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/09/2019 | 07/09/2020 | 07/09/2021 | 07/09/2022 | 07/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.23k | £1.12k | £453 | £519 | £880 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.84k | £0 | £1.59k | £165 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 September 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC: (A) BY PRESENTING PUBLIC CONCERTS (B) BY ORGANISING CHORAL WORKSHOPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL EVENTS (C) THROUGH RECORDINGS (D) BY COMMISSIONING AND PUBLISHING NEW CHORAL WORKS AND (E) IN SUCH OTHER WAY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AGREE (THE "OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Albert Road
RICHMOND
TW10 6DP
- Phone:
- 07949460768
- Email:
- foundation@kingssingers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window