Financial history UCL CANCER INSTITUTE RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1135220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £755.59k £1.94k £2.38k £792 £0
Total expenditure £333.43k £28.18k £727.70k £1.84k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £754.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £750.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £333.43k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £329.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A