Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESISASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT PAUL, MONK BRETTON

Charity number: 1138521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £39.37k £52.74k £48.72k £71.38k £75.71k
Total expenditure £46.56k £50.09k £54.23k £70.97k £70.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A