Financial history THE LITTLE ARK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1136923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £133.77k £159.65k £159.86k £166.61k £191.67k
Total expenditure £119.10k £134.30k £159.45k £159.89k £168.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A