Financial history THE LANCASTER UNIVERSITY CHAPLAINCY CENTRE

Charity Number: 500891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £17.77k £12.44k £15.99k £18.21k £18.83k
Total expenditure £19.67k £10.70k £11.85k £13.33k £12.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A