Accounts and annual returns E-QUIP COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1137572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 12 April 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required