RESTLESS LEGS SYNDROME-UK/EKBOM SYNDROME ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our primary focus is to raise awareness of RLS, to provide information and support to those living with RLS and to improve the quality of RLS care. Our website has up to date information for people with RLS and for professionals. Small research grants are offered and where possible training information for clinicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 March 2011: Standard registration
- RLS-UK/ESA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Julian Thomas William Spinks | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Limond | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Emma Sanderson-Nash | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wickens | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Abrams OBE | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Gould | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.50k | £8.08k | £10.06k | £16.65k | £21.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.33k | £2.17k | £5.21k | £17.02k | £19.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED 15 JANUARY 2011 as amended on 09 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM RESTLESS LEGS/EKBOM SYNDROME, THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROVIDING RESPONSIBLE AND USEFUL INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON THE ILLNESS AND RELATED AREAS; 2) INCREASING AWARENESS OF THE CONDITION AND ITS EFFECTS WITHIN THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND AMONG THE MEDICAL PROFESSION; 3) PROMOTING USEFUL RESEARCH INTO RESTLESS LEGS SYNDROME AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX BOX 11084
GRANTHAM
NG31 0LN
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window