Financial history MAGDALEN ROAD EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1136466
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.28m £249.98k £249.41k £265.77k £353.31k
Total expenditure £380.16k £267.65k £295.74k £275.95k £275.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £316.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £250 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £6.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £70 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £958.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £380.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A