SUBTERRANEA BRITANNICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of Subterranea Britannica is to encourage and promote the study of all aspects of man-made and man-used underground spaces, structures and objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Jersey
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
Governance
- 19 April 2011: Standard registration
- SUB BRIT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Wellburn | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil James Iosson | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Charles West | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Radstone | Trustee | 17 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew MARTIN DIXON | Trustee | 19 April 2011 |
|
|||||
LINDA JANE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.15k | £32.67k | £33.45k | £65.60k | £61.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.71k | £30.93k | £41.64k | £62.50k | £54.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND SCIENCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE STUDY, UNDERSTANDING, RECORDING AND (WHERE PRACTICAL) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF MAN-MADE AND MAN-USED UNDERGROUND STRUCTURES, OBJECTS AND SPACES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heath End Cottage
Windsor Road
Ascot
SL5 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01344875424
- Email:
- secretary@subbrit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window